Global Patent Index - EP 1096869 A1

EP 1096869 A1 2001-05-09 - LUMINESCENT ORNAMENTAL OBJECT

Title (en)

LUMINESCENT ORNAMENTAL OBJECT

Title (de)

LUMINESZIERENDER SCHMUCKGEGENSTAND

Title (fr)

OBJET D'ORNEMENT LUMINESCENT

Publication

EP 1096869 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00945524 A

Priority

  • DE 0001438 W
  • DE 19922480 A
  • DE 19958824 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0069303A1] The invention relates to an ornamental object, wherein an ornamental basic body is provided with a phosphorogen luminescence pigment in a support material. Preferably, the ornamental object is provided with at least two different luminescent colors. This is achieved by providing the ornamental basic body with a combination of alkaline earth aluminate based highly phosphorogen colored luminescent pigment (minimal luminance after 60 min > 35 mcd/m2) and another luminescent pigment of a different color. The ornamental object should be provided with two or more luminescent colors. This enhances the ornamental effect of the ornamental object.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 15/00 (2006.01); A44C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 15/0015 (2013.01); A44C 27/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0069303A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0069303 A1 20001123; EP 1096869 A1 20010509; TR 200100089 U2 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20071105

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI