Global Patent Index - EP 1096870 A1

EP 1096870 A1 2001-05-09 - SYSTEM FOR TIGHTENING THE SEAT SUPPORTS OF CHAIRS

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR TIGHTENING THE SEAT SUPPORTS OF CHAIRS

Title (de)

KLEMMUNG FÜR SITZTRÄGER VON STÜHLEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SERRAGE POUR SUPPORTS D'ASSISE DE CHAISES

Publication

EP 1096870 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966542 A

Priority

  • DE 9803678 W
  • DE 29812598 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003622A1] The present invention relates to a system for tightening the seat supports of chairs, mainly in rotating office chairs. In these chairs, the seat support comprises at least two parts which are capable of pivoting relative to each other about a common axis and which include each a set of blades hinged thereon. The two sets of blades are capable of engagement and include recesses through which the blades are hinged on a common transverse rod. The recesses of at least one of the sets of blades allow this set of blades to be displaced in a direction crossing the axis of the common rod. Means are also provided which can be placed in a tightening position with the blades of the two sets and which can be withdrawn from said position. The tightening means rest on one of the two parts or on another part of the seat support. A stop opposite to the tightening direction is provided for the blades in the seat support. The tightening means (9) are arranged so as to be capable of pivoting within the part (1), while their pivot axis extends transversely to the axis of the common rod (2). Means are further provided for pivoting the tightening means (9), wherein said means are guided out of the seat support and can be actuated from the outside. The tightening means include at their cross section an outline having at least two different thicknesses in the axial direction of the common rod (2). The tightening means further include at least two surfaces (15, 17) forming an angle relative to each other. In the tightening position, one surface (15) rests on the blades (7), or on an edge or shoulder acting on said surface, while applying a tightening force, wherein said surface (15) represents the inner end of the outline having the larger thickness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/027

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003622A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812598 U1 19981203; DK 1096870 T3 20040119; EP 1096870 A1 20010509; EP 1096870 B1 20031008; ES 2210862 T3 20040701; US 6467844 B1 20021022; WO 0003622 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051216

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051215

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-01-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-12-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-12-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210862 T3

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-01-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-19 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809887 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020826

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE