Global Patent Index - EP 1096920 A1

EP 1096920 A1 2001-05-09 - SCENTED OXYGEN

Title (en)

SCENTED OXYGEN

Title (de)

PARFÜMIERTER SAUERSTOFF

Title (fr)

OXYGENE PARFUME

Publication

EP 1096920 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938218 A

Priority

  • DE 19831374 A
  • EP 9904834 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19831374A1] An oxygen source containing one or more perfumes is new. Independent claims are also included for: (i) production of a perfume-containing oxygen source by adding an oxygen-containing phase to a perfume in an inert medium; and (ii) the use of ethers or esters in the production of perfumed oxygen gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/00; C01B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 16/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 16/10 (2013.01); A61M 2202/0291 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003690A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831374 A1 20000120; AU 5280499 A 20000207; EP 1096920 A1 20010509; WO 0003690 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050210

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE