Global Patent Index - EP 1096927 A4

EP 1096927 A4 2002-09-04 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF STRESS

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF STRESS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR STRESSBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU STRESS

Publication

EP 1096927 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99934107 A

Priority

  • US 9916153 W
  • US 9301398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003701A1] A method of treating stress in a patient showing stress related symptoms is disclosed, where the method comprises administering to the patient an effective amount serotoninergic drugs. Specific examples of this class of drugs are described, and include as examples, among others, the use of lithium, chlorimipramine, fluoxetine, fluvoxamine, sertraline, MK-212, Ro 60-0332/ORG 35035, Ro 60-175/ORG 35030, d,1-fenflurarnine, dexfenfluramine, or their salts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 45/08; A61K 31/55; A61P 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/135 (2006.01); A61K 31/138 (2006.01); A61K 31/15 (2006.01); A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 33/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/135 (2013.01); A61K 31/138 (2013.01); A61K 31/15 (2013.01); A61K 31/403 (2013.01); A61K 31/4045 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01); A61K 31/497 (2013.01); A61K 33/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9316695 A1 19930902 - CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]
  • [X] EP 0654264 A1 19950524 - LILLY CO ELI [US]
  • [X] US 5502080 A 19960326 - HITZIG PIETR [US]
  • [X] FR 2710916 A1 19950414 - PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198616, Derwent World Patents Index; Class B02, AN 1986-103235, XP002197787
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199132, Derwent World Patents Index; Class B06, AN 1991-236275, XP002197788
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199716, Derwent World Patents Index; Class B02, AN 1997-175671, XP002197789
  • [X] FRIEDMAN M J: "DRUG TREATMENT FOR PTSD. ANSWERS AND QUESTIONS", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK, NY, US, June 1997 (1997-06-01), pages 359 - 371, XP000914298, ISSN: 0077-8923
  • [X] DAVIDSON J R T: "BIOLOGICAL THERAPIES FOR POSTTRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER: AN OVERVIEW", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PSYCHIATRY, XX, XX, vol. 58, no. 9, 1997, pages 29 - 32, XP000914294, ISSN: 0160-6689
  • [X] NEAL L A ET AL: "AN OPEN TRIAL OF MOCLOBEMIDE IN THE TREATMENT OF POST-TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER", INTERNATIONAL CLINICAL PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, CLINICAL NEUROSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LONDON, GB, vol. 12, no. 4, July 1997 (1997-07-01), pages 231 - 237, XP000884760, ISSN: 0268-1315
  • [X] GRAEFF FREDERICO G ET AL: "Role of 5-HT in stress, anxiety and depression.", PHARMACOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY AND BEHAVIOR, vol. 54, no. 1, 1996, pages 129 - 141, XP002197781, ISSN: 0091-3057
  • [X] MCKITTRICK CHRISTINA R ET AL: "Serotonin receptor binding in a colony model of chronic social stress.", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, vol. 37, no. 6, 1995, pages 383 - 393, XP002197782, ISSN: 0006-3223
  • [X] PAPP MARIUSZ ET AL: "Pharmacological validation of the chronic mild stress model of depression.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 296, no. 2, 1996, pages 129 - 136, XP002197783, ISSN: 0014-2999
  • [X] ZETHOF THEO J J ET AL: "Stress-induced hyperthermia as a putative anxiety model.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 294, no. 1, 1995, pages 125 - 135, XP002197784, ISSN: 0014-2999
  • [X] DATABASE MEDLINE [online] 1988, BRINDLEY D N: "Metabolic and hormonal effects of dexfenfluramine on stress situations", XP002197785, Database accession no. NLM3180110 & CLINICAL NEUROPHARMACOLOGY., vol. 11, no. S1, 1988, pages s86 - s89CLINICAL NEUROPHARMACOLOGY.198811S1s86s89
  • [X] DATABASE MEDLINE [online] 1993, LEPINE ET AL: "Treatment of post-traumatic stress syndrome", XP002197786, Database accession no. NLM8030427 & ACTA PSYCHIATRICA BELGICA., vol. 93, no. 3, 1993, pages 121 - 35ACTA PSYCHIATRICA BELGICA.199393312135
  • See also references of WO 0003701A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003701 A1 20000127; CA 2337507 A1 20000127; EP 1096927 A1 20010509; EP 1096927 A4 20020904; JP 2002520353 A 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040202

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 45/08 A, 7A 61K 31/55 B, 7A 61P 9/12 B

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE