Global Patent Index - EP 1096980 A1

EP 1096980 A1 2001-05-09 - TRAVEL DEVICE SUCH AS A SKATEBOARD OR A SCOOTER AND SIMILAR

Title (en)

TRAVEL DEVICE SUCH AS A SKATEBOARD OR A SCOOTER AND SIMILAR

Title (de)

FAHRGERÄT WIE ROLLBRETT ODER ROLLER UND DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF A DEPLACEMENT TEL QU'UNE PLANCHE A ROULETTES OU DES PATINS A ROULETTES ET EQUIVALENT

Publication

EP 1096980 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948643 A

Priority

  • CH 9900506 W
  • CH 225798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2350437A1] The invention relates to a travel device, such as a skateboard or a scooter and similar, comprising two running gears (2, 3), each of which has at least one wheel (6), and at least one of said running gears (2, 3) being steerable . According to the invention, a foot-board (1) is provided, connecting the two running gears (2, 3). Said foot-board is elastically deformable and has a spring rate in the range of 0.03 to 0.25 mm/kg. The foot-board (1) is detachably connected to the running gears (2, 3). Several foot-boards (1) wi th different, progressive spring rates are provided so that the travel device c an be adapted to the different requirements of different users. The individual foot boards (1) are characterised by different dimensions and/or different materials. Reinforcement struts can also be introduced into the foot board (1). Running gears (2, 3) with different constructions and functioning modes can be combined with foot boards (1) of this type. The invention therefore provides a means of adapting a travel device to the user's requirements in terms of the quality of movement, especially the spring system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/00 (2006.01); A63C 17/01 (2006.01); A63C 17/02 (2006.01); A63C 17/26 (2006.01); B62K 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/013 (2013.01); A63C 17/01 (2013.01); A63C 17/014 (2013.01); A63C 17/015 (2013.01); A63C 17/26 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19982298 C1 20010913; AT 212244 T 20020215; AU 6185699 A 20000529; CA 2350437 A1 20000518; CH 692973 A5 20030115; DE 19982298 D2 20010412; DE 29923694 U1 20010118; DE 59900781 D1 20020314; EP 1096980 A1 20010509; EP 1096980 B1 20020123; EP 1096980 B2 20071114; JP 2002529167 A 20020910; WO 0027489 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900781

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101026

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101026

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101026

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101026

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MICRO MOBILITY SYSTEMS AG

- Free text: MICRO MOBILITY SYSTEMS AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 10#8700 KUESNACHT (CH) -TRANSFER TO- MICRO MOBILITY SYSTEMS AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 10#8700 KUESNACHT (CH)

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-01 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-12-27 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021028

2007-12-14 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-11-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071114

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MICRO MOBILITY SYSTEMS A.G.

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: K2 SKI SPORT + MODE GMBH

- Effective date: 20021002

2003-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CP VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT CALIFORNIAN PRODUCTS MBH

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-12-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CP VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT CALIFORNIAN PRODUCTS MBH

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021026

2002-08-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-04-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-04-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-04-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900781 20020314

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212244 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE