Global Patent Index - EP 1096999 A1

EP 1096999 A1 2001-05-09 - PLATE FOR BIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS AND PRESERVATION OF BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES

Title (en)

PLATE FOR BIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS AND PRESERVATION OF BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES

Title (de)

PLATTE ZUR ANALYSE UND AUFBEWAHRUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN

Title (fr)

PLAQUE POUR L'ANALYSE BIOLOGIQUE ET LA CONSERVATION D'ECHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 1096999 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99929483 A

Priority

  • FR 9901720 W
  • FR 9808996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780903A1] The invention concerns a plate designed for micro titration, having a plurality of removable cups for receiving biological liquid samples, characterised in that it consists of a moulded plastic material part with a top surface extended by lateral surfaces, the top surface bearing a plurality of cups (3) connected to the plate top surface by an embrittled zone, the cups bearing a top ring (4) for co-operating with a matching tool designed to exert on the cup a torque rupturing the embrittled zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/14; B01L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/14 (2006.01); B01L 9/06 (2006.01); G01N 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/5085 (2013.01); B01L 3/5453 (2013.01); B65D 2203/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002661A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780903 A1 20000114; FR 2780903 B1 20000929; AT 250979 T 20031015; AU 4628499 A 20000201; CA 2337338 A1 20000120; CA 2337338 C 20100112; DE 69911783 D1 20031106; DE 69911783 T2 20040902; EP 1096999 A1 20010509; EP 1096999 B1 20031001; ES 2209455 T3 20040616; JP 2002520579 A 20020709; JP 4377548 B2 20091202; PT 1096999 E 20040227; US 2001005491 A1 20010628; US 6540965 B2 20030401; WO 0002661 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170707

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-11-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Free text: NICOLAS BARA

2007-06-22 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NICOLAS BARA, FR

- Effective date: 20070612

2007-06-22 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: CENTRAL LABO EUROPE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20070612

2007-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NICOLAS BARA

- Effective date: 20070219

2007-04-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-03-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NICOLAS BARA

- Free text: CENTRAL LABO EUROPE (S.A.R.L.)#9, RUE FRANCAISE#75002 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- NICOLAS BARA#4 PLACE DU PUITS#60240 LAVILLETERTRE (FR)

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209455 T3

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040118

2004-01-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911783 P 20031106

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE