Global Patent Index - EP 1097002 A1

EP 1097002 A1 2001-05-09 - A METHOD OF FILLING A DISPENSING SYSTEM AND A DISPENSING SYSTEM

Title (en)

A METHOD OF FILLING A DISPENSING SYSTEM AND A DISPENSING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ABGABESYSTEM UND DESSEN BEFÜLLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION ET SON PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE

Publication

EP 1097002 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99933027 A

Priority

  • GB 9902248 W
  • GB 9815195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2335241A] A dispensing system for flowable material comprises a container having a cover 2 through which is mounted a pump 8. A stiff feed tube 3 extends from the pump 8 down to the foot of the container. A follower plate 5 which fits around the feed tube 3 and is slidable down inside the container, lies on top of the material M in the container and assists in clearing material from the container as dispensing proceeds. In order to help prime the pump 8 and avoid the follower plate 5 losing contact with the surface of the material M after container filling, e.g. on shrinkage of a warmed material, a spacer 100 is fitted between the top of the container and the follower plate 5 so that the follower plate 5 is forced down in the container on assembly. This also urges material up inside the feed tube 3 to assist pump priming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3074 (2013.01); B05B 11/00418 (2018.08); B05B 11/3001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2335241 A 19990915; GB 2335241 B 20000301; GB 9815195 D0 19980909; AT 365079 T 20070715; DE 69936345 D1 20070802; DE 69936345 T2 20080221; DK 1097002 T3 20070924; EP 1097002 A1 20010509; EP 1097002 B1 20070620; PT 1097002 E 20070917; WO 0002666 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070713

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070713

2008-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080325

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-09-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-09-17 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070905

2007-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69936345 P 20070802

2007-07-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-06-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-06-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-06-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE