Global Patent Index - EP 1097012 A1

EP 1097012 A1 2001-05-09 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INNER PROFILE OR AN OUTER PROFILE BY ROTARY KNEADING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INNER PROFILE OR AN OUTER PROFILE BY ROTARY KNEADING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER INNENPROFILIERUNG ODER EINER AUSSENPROFILIERUNG DURCH RUNDKNETEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA REALISATION D'UN PROFILAGE INTERIEUR OU D'UN PROFILAGE EXTERIEUR PAR RETREINTE

Publication

EP 1097012 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927943 A

Priority

  • DE 19827191 A
  • EP 9904000 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827191A1] The invention relates to a method for producing an inner profile (4) of a sleeve-type metal outer part (1) by rotary kneading. The inner profile (4) corresponds at least essentially to an outer profile (5) of an inner part (2) which can be inserted into the outer part (1) in the longitudinal direction of the same at least in sections, in the area of the inserting sections of the two parts. An outer profile (5) is provided on the inner part (2) and the inner part (2) is inserted into the outer part (1) at least in sections. A rotary kneading tool (3) which acts on the outer part (1) from outside is then used to produce an inner profile (4) on the outer part (1) which corresponds to the outer profile (5) of the inner part (2). Alternatively, the inner profile (4) of the outer part (1) can be used to produce the outer profile (5) of the inner part (2) using a rotary kneading tool (3) which acts upon the outer part (1) from outside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 5/12; B21C 37/20; B21K 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/20 (2006.01); B21K 1/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01); B21K 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/202 (2013.01); B21K 1/066 (2013.01); B21K 1/12 (2013.01); B21K 1/30 (2013.01); B21K 21/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965628A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827191 A1 19991223; EP 1097012 A1 20010509; EP 1097012 B1 20021113; WO 9965628 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903414

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903414 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT