Global Patent Index - EP 1097021 A1

EP 1097021 A1 2001-05-09 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING MATERIAL FROM WORKPIECES BY MEANS OF A LASER BEAM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REMOVING MATERIAL FROM WORKPIECES BY MEANS OF A LASER BEAM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM MATERIALABTRAGEN BEI WERKSTÜCKEN MITTELS LASERSTRAHL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ENLEVER DE LA MATIERE SUR DES PIECES A L'AIDE D'UN FAISCEAU LASER

Publication

EP 1097021 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00936661 A

Priority

  • DE 0001383 W
  • DE 19920813 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0067945A1] The invention relates to a device for removing material from a workpiece by means of a laser beam, especially a laser drilling device. The inventive device comprises a laser arrangement for producing a laser beam which consists of at least one laser pulse that is characterised by parameter values such as pulse duration and laser wavelength for instance. The aim of the invention is to improve such a device with regard to progress and accuracy of removal. The laser arrangement is configured in such a way that it produces at least two types of laser pulses which differ in at least one parameter value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/06 (2006.01); B23K 26/073 (2006.01); B23K 26/382 (2014.01); B23K 26/40 (2014.01); H01S 3/00 (2006.01); H01S 3/109 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/06 (2013.01); B23K 26/382 (2015.10); B23K 26/40 (2013.01); B23K 2203/50 (2015.10)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0067945A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0067945 A1 20001116; DE 19920813 A1 20010628; EP 1097021 A1 20010509; JP 2002543984 A 20021224

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI