Global Patent Index - EP 1097024 A1

EP 1097024 A1 2001-05-09 - APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A PLURALITY OF DRAWERS

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A PLURALITY OF DRAWERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN DES ZUGANGS ZU EINER MEHRZAHL VON SCHUBLADEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL REGISSANT L'ACCES A UNE PLURALITE DE TIROIRS

Publication

EP 1097024 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99933038 A

Priority

  • GB 9902262 W
  • GB 9815515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003836A1] Apparatus for controlling access to a plurality of drawers, in one embodiment being tool dispensing apparatus (10) comprising a housing (12), a plurality of drawers (26) within the housing (12), each drawer for storing one or more tools, and a control system (14-22, 34-50) for controlling access to the drawers (26). Preferably, the apparatus (10) comprises a plurality of drawer trays (28) located in the housing (12) and on each of which one or more drawers (26) is located. The drawers are preferably divided into compartments and a control mechanism for providing access to appropriate compartments is disclosed in detail.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 3/155; A61J 7/00; G07C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 41/00 (2006.01); A61J 7/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/46 (2006.01); G07F 11/62 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/462 (2013.01); G07F 11/62 (2013.01); E05B 47/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003836A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2339569 A 20000202; GB 9815515 D0 19980916; AT 235344 T 20030415; AU 4921399 A 20000207; DE 69906299 D1 20030430; DE 69906299 T2 20040909; EP 1097024 A1 20010509; EP 1097024 B1 20030326; ES 2196834 T3 20031216; JP 2002520179 A 20020709; WO 0003836 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170706

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196834 T3

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-07-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-07-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-06-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906299 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE