Global Patent Index - EP 1097031 A1

EP 1097031 A1 2001-05-09 - AGENTS AND METHOD FOR THE PROTECTIVE TREATMENT OF WOOD

Title (en)

AGENTS AND METHOD FOR THE PROTECTIVE TREATMENT OF WOOD

Title (de)

MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHUTZBEHANDLUNG VON HOLZ

Title (fr)

AGENTS ET PROCEDE POUR EFFECTUER UN TRAITEMENT PROTECTEUR DU BOIS

Publication

EP 1097031 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926219 A

Priority

  • CH 9900288 W
  • DE 19831036 A
  • DE 19926884 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2336931A1] The invention relates to agents for the protective treatment of wood against decay and insect infestation, which contain at least the following ingredients: a) between 10 and 90 parts coaltar oil, b) between 2 and 20 par ts of a quaternary ammonium compound with biocide action, and c) between 10 and 90 parts water. The agents provided for by the invention are easily prepared stable emulsions characterized, among other things, by good penetrating powe r, significantly reduced odour of the treated wood, absence of undesirable coaltar concentrations on the surface, markedly reduced bleeding of the treated wood during summer temperatures, significantly greater effectiveness despite a lower coaltar oil content and lower toxicity than pure coaltar oil .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27K 3/44; B27K 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/02 (2006.01); A01N 25/10 (2006.01); A01N 33/02 (2006.01); A01N 61/02 (2006.01); B27K 3/44 (2006.01); B27K 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27K 3/46 (2013.01); B27K 3/50 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • GREAVES H. ET AL: "Improved PEC Preservatives with Added Biocides", THE INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH GROUP ON WOOD PRESERVATION - SIXTEENTH ANNUAL MEETING, 12 May 1985 (1985-05-12) - 17 May 1985 (1985-05-17), BRAZIL, pages 1 - 7, XP002968669
  • HOPKINS K.W.: "CHEMICAL INFORMATION HANDOUT", article "Quatramine, Steeley Chemicals", pages: 1 - 4, XP002968670
  • BUDAVARI S. ET AL: "THE MERCK INDEX - AN ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICALS, DRUGS, AND BIOLOGICALS", 1996, MERCK & CO., INC., WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, article "1086: Benzalkonium Chloride", pages: 177, XP002968671
  • "RÖMPP LEXIKON CHEMIE", vol. 2.0, 1999, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, STUTTGART, article "Kreosot", XP002968672
  • See also references of WO 0002716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29923154 U1 20000330; AT 253438 T 20031115; AU 4356699 A 20000201; AU 759694 B2 20030417; BR 9912049 A 20010403; BR 9912049 B1 20100601; CA 2336931 A1 20000120; CA 2336931 C 20080916; CZ 20010040 A3 20020116; CZ 299917 B6 20081229; DK 1097031 T3 20040223; EE 04793 B1 20070416; EE 200100024 A 20020617; EP 1097031 A1 20010509; EP 1097031 B1 20031105; ES 2211097 T3 20040701; HU 0102995 A2 20011128; HU 0102995 A3 20030128; HU 229630 B1 20140328; IL 140666 D0 20020210; NO 20010183 A 20010213; NO 20010183 D0 20010111; NO 323895 B1 20070716; NZ 509289 A 20030530; PL 191467 B1 20060531; PL 345611 A1 20020102; PT 1097031 E 20040331; SK 20352000 A3 20010510; SK 285573 B6 20070405; TR 200100041 T2 20010723; WO 0002716 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150703

2017-02-02 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170202

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160718

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160609

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040400399

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160104

2016-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150702

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150702

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-03-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20160222

2016-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150702

2016-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-01-25 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20150702

2016-01-12 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160104

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140718

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140709

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211097 T3

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-03-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400399

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907642 P 20031211

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20001211;LV PAYMENT 20001211;MK;RO PAYMENT 20001211;SI PAYMENT 20001211