Global Patent Index - EP 1097039 A1

EP 1097039 A1 2001-05-09 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A HYDRAULICALLY ACTUATED CLUTCH BRAKE COMBINATION FOR THE DRIVE SHAFT OF A MECHANICAL PRESS

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A HYDRAULICALLY ACTUATED CLUTCH BRAKE COMBINATION FOR THE DRIVE SHAFT OF A MECHANICAL PRESS

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE STEUERUNG FÜR EINE HYDRAULISCH BETÄTIGBARE KUPPLUNGSBREMSKOMBINATION FÜR DIE ANTRIEBSWELLE EINER MECHANISCHEN PRESSE

Title (fr)

COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE POUR COMBINAISON DE FREIN D'EMBRAYAGE A COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE POUR L'ARBRE PRIMAIRE D'UNE PRESSE MECANIQUE

Publication

EP 1097039 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932829 A

Priority

  • DE 19831144 A
  • EP 9904691 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19831144A1] The invention is based on a hydraulic control system for a hydraulically actuated clutch brake combination (13, 15) for the drive shaft (12) of a mechanical press. A known control mechanism of this kind has a source of a pressure medium with a hydraulic pump (25) and a hydraulic accumulator (26), for supplying a hydraulic actuator (18) with a pressure medium; a safety valve arrangement (44) with an intake connection (43), a flow path from the source of the pressure medium to the hydraulic actuator passing via said intake connection; and an adjustable pressure valve (33). The hydraulic actuator (18) is subjected to different work pressures in dependence on the adjustment of said pressure valve. The aim of the invention is to reduce the number of parts required compared to the known control system. To this end, the pressure valve (33) is a three-way pressure-regulating valve with a pressure connection (32) that can be connected to the source of the pressure medium, a tank connection (40) and a regulating connection which is connected to the intake connection of the safety valve device (44). There is no intervention in the connection between the safety valve arrangement and the hydraulic actuator as a result of this pressure-regulating valve and the way in which it is connected. When the pressure in the area of the regulating connection needs to be reduced, the hydraulic accumulator (26) is also blocked off and a flow path from the regulating connection to the tank connection is opened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/14 (2006.01); F16D 48/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002720A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831144 A1 20000113; EP 1097039 A1 20010509; EP 1097039 B1 20021211; ES 2189441 T3 20030701; WO 0002720 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140707

2015-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150827

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140706

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189441 T3

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903768 20030123

2002-12-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001216

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE