Global Patent Index - EP 1097042 A1

EP 1097042 A1 2001-05-09 - METHOD FOR APPLYING BY SECTIONS THE DECORATIVE LAYER OF A TRANSFER FILM ON A SUBSTRATE AND APPROPRIATE TRANSFER FILM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR APPLYING BY SECTIONS THE DECORATIVE LAYER OF A TRANSFER FILM ON A SUBSTRATE AND APPROPRIATE TRANSFER FILM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEREICHSWEISEN ÜBERTRAGUNG DER DEKORLAGE EINER TRANSFERFOLIE AUF EIN SUBSTRAT SOWIE HIERFÜR GEEIGNETE TRANSFERFOLIE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'APPLICATION PAR ZONES DE LA COUCHE DECORATIVE D'UN FILM DE TRANSFERT SUR UN SUBSTRAT, ET FILM DE TRANSFERT ADEQUAT

Publication

EP 1097042 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00940147 A

Priority

  • DE 0001302 W
  • DE 19921579 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19921579A1] The invention relates to a method for applying by sections a decoratrive layer (3) with an activatable adhesive layer (7) of a transfer layer from a carrier film (1) onto a substrate (11), wherein said adhesive layer of the transfer film is activated partially before the embossing process is effected by activating only those surface areas in the adhesive layer on which the decorative layer is to be applied on the substrate. A transfer film that is particularly suitable for implementing said method includes an absorption layer (6) absorbing a radiation energy that provokes activation of the adhesive layer and activating said adhesive layer under the effect of the absorbed radiation energy in the surface areas of the decorative layer that are to be applied on the substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 19/06; B44C 1/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/165 (2006.01); B41F 19/06 (2006.01); B41M 5/035 (2006.01); B44C 1/17 (2006.01); B65C 9/25 (2006.01); B65C 9/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/025 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/0358 (2013.01); B41M 5/025 (2013.01); Y10S 428/914 (2013.01); Y10T 428/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1486 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1495 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24843 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24876 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2817 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0068013A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19921579 A1 20001116; DE 19921579 C2 20020207; AT 244637 T 20030715; AU 5520500 A 20001121; AU 758536 B2 20030327; BR 0006109 A 20010403; CA 2336854 A1 20001116; CA 2336854 C 20060418; CN 1174865 C 20041110; CN 1304361 A 20010718; EP 1097042 A1 20010509; EP 1097042 B1 20030709; ES 2202140 T3 20040401; JP 2002544068 A 20021224; JP 3617625 B2 20050209; PT 1097042 E 20031128; RU 2200673 C2 20030320; US 6531016 B1 20030311; WO 0068013 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180417

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090423

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-02-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-10-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080426

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-13 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: LEONHARD KURZ GMBH & CO.KG, DE

- Effective date: 20080304

2008-03-13 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: LEONHARD KURZ STIFTUNG & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20080304

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LEONHARD *KURZ G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040422

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202140 T3

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002816 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020221

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI