Global Patent Index - EP 1097045 A1

EP 1097045 A1 2001-05-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONDITIONING A CONTINUOUS PAPER SHEET

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONDITIONING A CONTINUOUS PAPER SHEET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONDITIONIERUNG EINER PAPIERBAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE CONDITIONNEMENT D'UNE FEUILLE CONTINUE DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1097045 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00931103 A

Priority

  • DE 19920091 A
  • EP 0003952 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19920091A1] The invention relates to a method according to which between 0.1 and 2 % silicone is added to the rewetting fluid used to rewet freshly printed, dried paper sheets (1), so that the rewetting and silicone treatment of such paper sheets can be carried out in a single step. To condition a continuous paper sheet (1) in this manner a conditioning device (8) is used which comprises spray devices (9). At least each spray device (9) assigned to each printed side of the continuous paper sheet (1) can be supplied with a mixture of rewetting fluid and silicone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/00; B41F 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0066365A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19920091 A1 20001116; CN 1302261 A 20010704; EP 1097045 A1 20010509; JP 2002542970 A 20021217; WO 0066365 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-10-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALDWIN GERMANY GMBH

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE