Global Patent Index - EP 1097086 A1

EP 1097086 A1 2001-05-09 - REMOVABLE CASE FOR OPENING AND CLOSING A PRESSURIZED CAN PROVIDED WITH A FRANGIBLE OBTURATOR

Title (en)

REMOVABLE CASE FOR OPENING AND CLOSING A PRESSURIZED CAN PROVIDED WITH A FRANGIBLE OBTURATOR

Title (de)

LÖSBARE HÜLSE ZUM ÖFFNEN UND WIEDERVERSCHLIESSEN EINER GETRÄNKE DOSE MIT AUFREISSLASCHE

Title (fr)

ETUI AMOVIBLE POUR L'OUVERTURE ET LE REBOUCHAGE D'UNE BOITE A BOISSON MUNIE D'UN OBTURATEUR FRANGIBLE

Publication

EP 1097086 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98932223 A

Priority

FR 9801271 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965780A1] The invention relates to a method and devices for opening a drinks can (2) formed by a metal cylindrical body (3) and a crimped lid (4) provided with a frangible obturator (6) which can be pushed back inside the can (2) using a tongue that is fixed in a horizontal position in the middle of the lid (4) by means of a rivet (8) on which said tongue can pivot as a lever to produce an opening (7) which is later closed by a movable case that is adapted on the tongue which is pivoted around the rivet (8) in order to move onto the opening (7), whereby the case is clipped onto the hem of the crimping using means that are known per se. The invention is characterised in that the tongue is replaced by a deformable linking member (9) that unites the case (1) and the lid (4) allowing for a vertical rotational movement so that said case(1) that pivots around the member (9) as a lever on the rivet (8) depresses the obturator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/42 (2006.01); B65D 17/32 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/166 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0014 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0034 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0061 (2013.01); Y10S 220/906 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965780A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965780 A1 19991223; AT 248754 T 20030915; AU 744397 B2 20020221; AU 8219998 A 20000105; CA 2334995 A1 19991223; CA 2334995 C 20051129; DE 69817885 D1 20031009; DE 69817885 T2 20040715; EP 1097086 A1 20010509; EP 1097086 B1 20030903; ES 2207842 T3 20040601; JP 2002518258 A 20020625; JP 3796652 B2 20060712; US 6763963 B1 20040720

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130104

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120617

2013-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030404968

- Effective date: 20130104

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120617

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120617

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69817885

- Effective date: 20120103

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AKLINE

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207842 T3

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404968

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-12-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817885 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AKLINE

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE