Global Patent Index - EP 1097101 A1

EP 1097101 A1 2001-05-09 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM HAVING DRIVE MOTOR LOCATED AT THE BOTTOM PORTION OF THE HOISTWAY

Title (en)

ELEVATOR SYSTEM HAVING DRIVE MOTOR LOCATED AT THE BOTTOM PORTION OF THE HOISTWAY

Title (de)

AUFZUGSSYSTEMMIT AM UNTEREREM TEIL DES SCHACHTES ANGEORDNETEM ANTRIEB

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ASCENSEUR PRESENTANT UN MOTEUR D'ENTRAINEMENT SITUE AU NIVEAU DE LA PORTION INFERIEURE DE LA CAGE D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1097101 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99936068 A

Priority

  • US 9903646 W
  • US 3110898 A
  • US 16282198 A
  • US 21899098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943600A1] An elevator system includes an elevator hoistway defined in a surrounding structure, such as a building. An elevator car and counterweight are located in the hoistway. A drive motor and associated drive sheave are disposed at a bottom portion of the hoistway. The drive motor is coupled to the elevator car and the counterweight via at least one flat rope for moving the elevator car upwardly and downwardly along the hoistway.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/08; B66B 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/10 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/009 (2013.01); B66B 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943600A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943600 A1 19990902; DE 69936206 D1 20070712; DE 69936206 T2 20080131; EP 1097101 A1 20010509; EP 1097101 B1 20070530; ES 2285850 T3 20071116

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69936206

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160219

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150819

2015-08-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150819

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2285850 T3

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69936206 P 20070712

2007-06-19 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070606

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT