Global Patent Index - EP 1097146 A1

EP 1097146 A1 2001-05-09 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2-AMINO-4-CHLORO-1, 3, 5-TRIAZINES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2-AMINO-4-CHLORO-1, 3, 5-TRIAZINES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-AMINO-4-CHLOR-1,3,5-TRIAZINEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION DE 2-AMINO-4-CHLORO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES

Publication

EP 1097146 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932785 A

Priority

  • DE 19830902 A
  • EP 9904581 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830902A1] Compounds of formula (I) or their salts are suitable for producing active agents from the class of aminotriazines of formula (IV), for example herbicide agents. Said compounds of formula (I) are produced by chlorinating compounds of formula (II). R<1>, R<2>, R<3> and X in said formulae are defined according to Claim 1 and A and R have the meanings required in the active agents being produced. The compounds can then be converted to the active agents with amines of formula A-NH-R.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 251/16; A01N 43/68; C07D 251/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/68 (2006.01); C07D 251/16 (2006.01); C07D 251/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 251/16 (2013.01); C07D 251/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002868A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830902 A1 20000113; AU 4904899 A 20000201; BR 9911975 A 20010327; CN 1155582 C 20040630; CN 1306518 A 20010801; EP 1097146 A1 20010509; HU 0105180 A2 20020429; HU 0105180 A3 20040301; JP 2002520321 A 20020709; RU 2001103751 A 20030210; RU 2271353 C2 20060310; US 7002011 B1 20060221; WO 0002868 A1 20000120; ZA 200006795 B 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080117

2007-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030924

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE