Global Patent Index - EP 1097147 A1

EP 1097147 A1 2001-05-09 - NOVEL ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS

Title (en)

NOVEL ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS

Title (de)

NEUE ANGIOGENESE-INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS DE L'ANGIOGENESE

Publication

EP 1097147 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99937204 A

Priority

  • GB 9822700 A
  • US 9915200 W
  • US 9228598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0002871A1] The present invention relates to compounds which inhibit tyrosine kinase enzymes, compositions which contain tyrosine kinase inhibiting compounds and methods of using tyrosine kinase inhibitors to treat tyrosine kinase-dependent diseases and conditions such as angiogenesis, cancer, atherosclerosis, diabetic retinopathy or autoimmune diseases, in mammals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 263/48; A61K 31/42; A61K 31/425; C07D 277/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 277/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/42 (2006.01); A61K 31/421 (2006.01); A61K 31/422 (2006.01); A61K 31/425 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 263/48 (2006.01); C07D 277/46 (2006.01); C07D 413/04 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01); C07D 417/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/42 (2013.01); A61K 31/421 (2013.01); A61K 31/422 (2013.01); A61K 31/425 (2013.01); A61K 31/426 (2013.01); A61K 31/427 (2013.01); A61K 31/4439 (2013.01); A61K 31/4709 (2013.01); C07D 263/48 (2013.01); C07D 277/20 (2013.01); C07D 277/46 (2013.01); C07D 413/04 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01); C07D 417/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0002871 A1 20000120; AU 5208299 A 20000201; AU 747427 B2 20020516; CA 2336848 A1 20000120; EP 1097147 A1 20010509; EP 1097147 A4 20011121; JP 2002520324 A 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030918

2001-11-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 263/48 A, 7C 07D 277/46 B, 7A 61K 31/42 B, 7A 61K 31/425 B, 7C 07D 413/04 B, 7C 07D 413/14 B

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI