Global Patent Index - EP 1097245 A1

EP 1097245 A1 2001-05-09 - METHOD FOR WET GRANULATION OF LIQUID-SLAG

Title (en)

METHOD FOR WET GRANULATION OF LIQUID-SLAG

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM NASSGRANULIEREN VON FLÜSSIGER SCHLACKE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE GRANULATION PAR VOIE HUMIDE DE LAITIER LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1097245 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929210 A

Priority

  • EP 9904111 W
  • LU 90255 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000649A1] A simple and compact device for wet granulation of liquid slag, comprising a granulating basin (14) with a water injection device and a decanting basin (16) that is separate from the granulating basin (14). A distribution channel (40) for the granulate-water mixture extends above the decanting basin (16) and is provided with outflow means (42) along the entire length and on the lower side thereof for the granulate-water mixture. A vertical inflow shaft (54) that is open towards the bottom is arranged underneath the distribution channel (40). The outflow means (42) for the granulate-water mixture discharges into said inflow shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000649A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000649 A1 20000106; AT 231923 T 20030215; AU 4610399 A 20000117; AU 743721 B2 20020131; BR 9911391 A 20010313; CA 2334197 A1 20000106; CA 2334197 C 20080812; CN 1218052 C 20050907; CN 1305533 A 20010725; DE 59904173 D1 20030306; EP 1097245 A1 20010509; EP 1097245 B1 20030129; ES 2191439 T3 20030901; JP 2003520290 A 20030702; LU 90255 A1 20000103; TW 426549 B 20010321; US 6516632 B1 20030211; ZA 200007698 B 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130616

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130615

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904173

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130615

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 231923 T

- Effective date: 20130615

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130616

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191439 T3

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904173 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR SE

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR WET GRANULATION OF LIQUID-SLAG

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR SE