Global Patent Index - EP 1097261 A2

EP 1097261 A2 2001-05-09 - GALVANIC BATH, METHOD FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED HARD CHROMIUM LAYERS AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

GALVANIC BATH, METHOD FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED HARD CHROMIUM LAYERS AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

GALVANISCHES BAD UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG STRUKTURIERTER HARTCHROMSCHICHTEN UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

BAIN GALVANIQUE, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES COUCHES STRUCTUREES DE CHROME DUR ET UTILISATION DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1097261 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99931178 A

Priority

  • DE 19828545 A
  • EP 9904412 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828545C1] The invention relates to a galvanic bath, to a method for precipitating chromium onto objects using said galvanic bath, and to the use of this method for producing structured hard chromium layers on machine parts. The galvanic bath contains at least one compound which provides chromium (VI) ions, in an aqueous solution, and comprises a) a quantity of chromium (VI) ions corresponding to 100 to 600 g/l chromic acid anhydride, b) sulphate ions in the form of sulphuric acid and/or a soluble salt thereof, the molar concentration ratio of chromium (VI) ions to sulphate ions (SO4<2->) being 90:1 to 120:1 and c) a quantity of 2-hydroxyethane sulphonate ions corresponding to 0.01 to 3.0 g/l of the sodium salt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/04 (2006.01); B41N 7/04 (2006.01); C25D 3/10 (2006.01); C25D 5/14 (2006.01); C25D 5/16 (2006.01); C25D 5/18 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); C25D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/10 (2013.01); B41N 7/04 (2013.01); B41N 2207/02 (2013.01); B41N 2207/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000672A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828545 C1 19990812; AT 231933 T 20030215; BR 9912214 A 20010410; CA 2334708 A1 20000106; CN 1191392 C 20050302; CN 1307652 A 20010808; CZ 20004789 A3 20011212; CZ 299000 B6 20080402; EP 1097261 A2 20010509; EP 1097261 B1 20030129; JP 2002519514 A 20020702; RU 2202005 C2 20030410; US 6447666 B1 20020910; WO 0000672 A2 20000106; WO 0000672 A3 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904174

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HARTCHROM AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CROMOTECH OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH, 70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59904174

- Effective date: 20110722

2011-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904174

- Representative's name: LOESENBECK UND KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20110722

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100624

2011-07-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904174

- Representative's name: LOESENBECK UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100624

2011-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2011-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HARTCHROM AG

- Free text: CROMOTECH OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH#LUCAS-CRANACH-STRASSE 7#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HARTCHROM AG#SCHULSTRASSE 70#9323 STEINACH (CH)

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CROMOTECH OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: CROMOTECH OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH#LUCAS-CRANACH-STRASSE 7#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CROMOTECH OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH#LUCAS-CRANACH-STRASSE 7#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904174 P 20030306

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE