Global Patent Index - EP 1097265 A1

EP 1097265 A1 2001-05-09 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING A FLAT ARTICLE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING A FLAT ARTICLE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPORT EINES FLÄCHIGEN WARENSTÜCKES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR TRANSPORTER UN ARTICLE PLAT

Publication

EP 1097265 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924790 A

Priority

  • DE 9901058 W
  • DE 19831992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19831992A1] The assembly for the transport of flat materials, where they are transferred from one conveyor to another, has a continuous conveyor (12) as the second unit formed by a belt, strips or chains with at least one carrier (3) and pref. two at intervals across the direction of movement. Each carrier (3) has a strip laying surface (10), parallel to the direction of travel (6), where the carriers support the materials especially with intermediate edge sections. Each carrier (3) is deflected in its path, to form a buffer loop (13), with a deflection zone opposite to the direction of travel (6) into a transfer position. A further continuous conveyor (15) is parallel to the first conveyor (12), pref. close it. It moves at the same speed and in the same direction as the carriers (3) of the first conveyor (12). The deflection zone (14) for the first conveyor (12) is set back from the transfer position into the basic position, so that the material is taken by the second conveyor (15), and the conveyor moves out of the deflection zone at the transport speed back into the basic position. Both conveyors are continuous loops, with toothed belts as the carriers (3,15) which mesh with toothed wheels for deflection and drive. The closely neighboring carriers (3,15) of both conveyors have a common drive (24) in a synchronized drive in the same direction. Each carrier (3), and especially the toothed belts of the first conveyor (12), pass round a deflection wheel (16) at the leading deflection end . The upper level is moved in the transport direction (6) to form a double loop (13) round two deflection wheels (25,18) so that it travels back against the transport direction into the transfer position and then onwards in the transport direction. The lower level of the conveyor is supported at the laying surface (10). The setting drive for the carrier movements or the counter deflection section (14) operates by registering the location of the material, together with the nominal position under the run-out position of the lower level of the carrier (13) of the first conveyor (12) or the lower level (15) of the second conveyor. Where the assembly is for the movement of fabric sections, cut from piecegoods, the transfer unit is a clamp. The edges of the fabric are parallel to the movement direction of the second carrier (3) sides and at a gap from them, to be clamped on the plane of the first conveyor and, with the clamp, moved into the plane of the second conveyor in a to and fro motion, and the second carrier (3) also moves to and from the clamp. The second carrier (3) has continuous belts which, in the movement direction, are external and close to the alignment line of the clamp, to press the fabric edges against the laying strips (10) of both conveyors. The clamp has two clamping beams. The clamp and the carrier (3) can be brought together, for the fabric edges to be transferred from the clamp to the carrier without a gap between the flat materials. The laying surface (10) can be a flat plate or table, or an additional continuous conveyor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 33/00; B65H 29/46; B65H 5/04; A41H 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/02 (2006.01); A41H 43/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/46 (2006.01); D05B 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 33/00 (2013.01); A41H 43/0235 (2013.01); B65H 5/04 (2013.01); B65H 29/46 (2013.01); B65H 2301/142 (2013.01); B65H 2404/254 (2013.01); B65H 2701/176 (2013.01); Y10S 83/937 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0448 (2015.04); Y10T 83/0467 (2015.04); Y10T 83/178 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2024 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2187 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2192 (2015.04); Y10T 83/445 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4632 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7493 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831992 A1 20000127; DE 19831992 C2 20000713; AT 234380 T 20030315; AU 4133099 A 20000207; AU 742055 B2 20011213; BR 9912824 A 20010502; CN 1114730 C 20030716; CN 1309731 A 20010822; CZ 20010199 A3 20010815; CZ 299184 B6 20080514; EP 1097265 A1 20010509; EP 1097265 B1 20030312; ES 2190215 T3 20030716; HU 0102047 A2 20011028; HU 0102047 A3 20020228; HU 224003 B1 20050428; ID 28257 A 20010510; JP 2000086002 A 20000328; JP 4196239 B2 20081217; KR 100392444 B1 20030723; PL 188684 B1 20050331; PL 345546 A1 20011217; PT 1097265 E 20030829; TR 200100069 T2 20010621; TW 464481 B 20011121; US 6230596 B1 20010515; WO 0004218 A1 20000127; YU 49335 B 20050719; YU 83400 A 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130715

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904548

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 234380 T

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHMALE-HOLDING G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-10-10 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110408

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190215 T3

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904548 P 20030417

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE