Global Patent Index - EP 1097272 A1

EP 1097272 A1 2001-05-09 - RAMMING DEVICE COMPRISING A VIBRATION REDUCING GUIDE CYLINDER

Title (en)

RAMMING DEVICE COMPRISING A VIBRATION REDUCING GUIDE CYLINDER

Title (de)

STAMPFGERÄT MIT SCHWINGUNGSGEDÄMPFTEM FÜHRUNGSZYLINDER

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE PILONNAGE A CYLINDRE DE GUIDAGE AMORTISSANT LES VIBRATIONS

Publication

EP 1097272 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934621 A

Priority

  • DE 19830979 A
  • EP 9904782 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830979A1] A working device, especially a ramming device for compacting soil, comprises a housing (3) which belongs to an upper mass, and has a working mass which can be linearly driven back and forth with regard to the upper mass. The working mass is linearly guided via a guide cylinder (20) which is fastened to the housing (3) with elastic mobility. The transfer of bounce impacts acting upon the working mass to the upper mass can be effectively reduced by the elastic mobility of the guide cylinder (20) with regard to the housing (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/068 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18208 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003096A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830979 A1 20000113; DE 19830979 C2 20021024; AT 231205 T 20030215; EP 1097272 A1 20010509; EP 1097272 B1 20030115; JP 2002520514 A 20020709; US 6443651 B1 20020903; WO 0003096 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904052

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904052

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130707

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130708

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130707

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120426 AND 20120502

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59904052

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904052

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904052

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20030731

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-12-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1097272E

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-04-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904052 P 20030220

2003-02-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020205

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE