Global Patent Index - EP 1097275 A1

EP 1097275 A1 2001-05-09 - Assembly, to be used within a waste water system, being composed of a receptacle, a removable coating and means to connect the coating to the receptacle

Title (en)

Assembly, to be used within a waste water system, being composed of a receptacle, a removable coating and means to connect the coating to the receptacle

Title (de)

Einheit, zur Verwendung in Abwassersystemen, zusammengesetzt aus einem Behälter, einer entfernbaren Auskleidung und Mitteln zur Befestigung der Auskleidung an dem Behälter

Title (fr)

Ensemble, à être utilisé dans un système des eaux usées, être composé d'un réceptacle, un revêtement amovible et un dispositif pour fixer le revêtement au réceptacle

Publication

EP 1097275 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928918 A

Priority

  • BR 9900031 W
  • BR 9801250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961714A1] It has application in several tied up receptacles to canalizations, mainly in boxes of thin and fat boxes, and it seeks to solve the difficulty of removal of dirts of its interior, as well as, in certain cases, to get a more frequent maintenance, in order to avoid rotting and the formation of gases with unpleasant scents. It presents a group of creations, involving divisible receptacle of dirt, device for connection of coating, disposable removable coating and accessories that are integrated, and which present in synthesis a removable coating (7) that receives the dirt, inside the receptacle (1) which becomes endowed with devices (2) that facilitate connections of the coating and, in this case, of siphon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/04; E03C 1/282

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/041 (2013.01); E03F 5/0407 (2013.01); E03F 2005/0416 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961714A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961714 A1 19991202; AR 018406 A1 20011114; AT 310857 T 20051215; AU 4593599 A 19991213; BR 9801250 A 19991228; BR 9801250 C1 20001031; CN 1303455 A 20010711; DE 69928535 D1 20051229; DE 69928535 T2 20060810; EP 1097275 A1 20010509; EP 1097275 B1 20051123; ES 2253896 T3 20060601; UY 25531 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140511

2016-02-02 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160202

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69928535

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140510

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 310857 T

- Effective date: 20140510

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69928535

2014-11-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130502

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120518

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GRAZZIOTIN, FERNANDO ALBERTO

- Free text: GRAZZIOTIN, FERNANDO ALBERTO#RUA FRANCISCO ALVES, 396, VILA RODRIGUES#CEP-99070-130 PASSO FUNDO, RS (BR) -TRANSFER TO- GRAZZIOTIN, FERNANDO ALBERTO#RUA FRANCISCO ALVES, 396, VILA RODRIGUES#CEP-99070-130 PASSO FUNDO, RS (BR)

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253896 T3

2006-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69928535 P 20051229

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ASSEMBLY, TO BE USED WITHIN A WASTE WATER SYSTEM, BEING COMPOSED OF A RECEPTACLE, A REMOVABLE COATING AND MEANS TO CONNEC

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT