Global Patent Index - EP 1097303 A2

EP 1097303 A2 2001-05-09 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION DEVICE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1097303 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99960917 A

Priority

  • DE 9903661 W
  • DE 19860476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860476A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection device for an internal combustion engine having at least one cylinder, each cylinder having an injection unit (1) and each injection unit (1) having a flow limiting valve (14) that blocks the fuel supply to the injection nozzle (7) contained in the injection unit (1) when the fuel flowing out of the flow limiting valve (14) reaches a maximum fuel volume. According to the invention, in order to reduce the maximum fuel volume in said fuel injection device, the flow limiting valve (14) is disposed in a nozzle admission line (13) by means of which the injection nozzle (7) communicates with a high pressure fuel delivery line (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/02; F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0205 (2013.01); F02M 2200/703 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039452A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860476 A1 20000706; EP 1097303 A2 20010509; JP 2002533614 A 20021008; KR 20010041338 A 20010515; US 6374802 B1 20020423; WO 0039452 A2 20000706; WO 0039452 A3 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE