Global Patent Index - EP 1097364 A1

EP 1097364 A1 2001-05-09 - DIAGNOSTIC TEST DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES WHICH COMPRISES A PORTABLE TESTING APPARATUS

Title (en)

DIAGNOSTIC TEST DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES WHICH COMPRISES A PORTABLE TESTING APPARATUS

Title (de)

DIAGNOSETESTVORRICHTUNG MIT PORTABLEM PRÜFGERÄT FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TEST DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR AUTOMOBILES, COMPORTANT UN APPAREIL DE CONTROLE PORTATIF

Publication

EP 1097364 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00943571 A

Priority

  • DE 0001443 W
  • DE 19921846 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19921846A1] The invention relates to a diagnostic test device for motor vehicles which comprises a portable testing apparatus, whereby control units equipped with self-diagnosing means are installed in the motor vehicle. Said control units control and monitor the engine control and other systems of the motor vehicle, generate and store error codes, and can be connected to an external testing apparatus via a diagnostic/test plug located in the motor vehicle. According to the invention, the external portable testing apparatus is equipped with a modem and is connected to a mobile telephone, in order to carry out a diagnosis of errors and troubleshooting at locations away from stationary repair facilities over an appropriately constructed network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01M 17/007; G05B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01M 15/05 (2006.01); G05B 23/02 (2006.01); G07C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/008 (2013.01); G01M 15/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0068660A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19921846 A1 20001123; CN 100429498 C 20081029; CN 1304487 A 20010718; EP 1097364 A1 20010509; US 6535112 B1 20030318; WO 0068660 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121201

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061027

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE