Global Patent Index - EP 1097404 A1

EP 1097404 A1 2001-05-09 - PROJECTION LENS FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY

Title (en)

PROJECTION LENS FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY

Title (de)

PROJEKTIONSOBJEKTIV FÜR DIE MIKROLITHOGRAPHIE

Title (fr)

OBJECTIF DE PROJECTION POUR LA MICROLITHOGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 1097404 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99967978 A

Priority

  • DE 19922209 A
  • EP 9910233 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6801364B2] The invention relates to a projection lens comprising a lens assembly that has at least one first narrowing of the group of light beams. A lens with a non-spherical surface is located in front of and/or behind the first narrowing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 7/20; G02B 13/14; G02B 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 13/24 (2006.01); G02B 13/14 (2006.01); G02B 13/18 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/70241 (2013.01); G02B 13/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0070407A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

US 2002149855 A1 20021017; US 6801364 B2 20041005; DE 19942281 A1 20001116; EP 1097404 A1 20010509; JP 2002544569 A 20021224; US 2005030635 A1 20050210; US 7154677 B2 20061226; WO 0070407 A1 20001123

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091016

2009-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090605

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS CARL ZEISS

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE