Global Patent Index - EP 1097407 A1

EP 1097407 A1 2001-05-09 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING AND LOCKING A WATCH INTERCHANGEABLE FUNCTIONAL MODULE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PROTECTING AND LOCKING A WATCH INTERCHANGEABLE FUNCTIONAL MODULE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ UND ZUR VERRIEGELUNG DES AUSZIEHBAREN TEILS EINER ARMBANDUHR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PROTEGER ET VERROUILLER LE MODULE FONCTIONNEL INTERCHANGEABLE D'UNE MONTRE

Publication

EP 1097407 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99918221 A

Priority

  • FR 9804814 A
  • IB 9900895 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777650A1] The interchangeable working part of the watch and its container (1) is enclosed within a protective case (7) which reveals only the indicating dial and the winding mechanism (4). The joint between the crown and the spindle sleeve is made watertight by jointing rings (8,9). A nut (6) is added to ensure firm location to the protective case when locked. The nut enables visual indication (10) of correct locking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 3/04; G04B 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/04 (2006.01); G04B 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/283 (2013.01); G04B 3/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954789A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777650 A1 19991022; FR 2777650 B1 20000616; AT 235073 T 20030415; AU 3623499 A 19991108; DE 69906083 D1 20030424; EP 1097407 A1 20010509; EP 1097407 B1 20030319; WO 9954789 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *JAPY HORLOGERIE ET INSTRUMENTATION

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-06-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906083 P 20030424

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT