Global Patent Index - EP 1097439 A1

EP 1097439 A1 2001-05-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING DRIFTS, JUMPS AND/OR OUTLIERS OF MEASUREMENT VALUES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING DRIFTS, JUMPS AND/OR OUTLIERS OF MEASUREMENT VALUES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON DRIFTEN, SPRÜNGEN UND/ODER AUSREISSERN VON MESSWERTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER DES DERIVES, DES SAUTS ET/OU DES POINTS ABERRANTS DE VALEURS DE MESURE

Publication

EP 1097439 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939929 A

Priority

  • DE 9901820 W
  • DE 19827508 A
  • DE 19839047 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6556957B1] A method for detection an alarm state of measurement signal values received by means for detecting measurement values, wherein an alarm state is triggered when for a currently received measurement signal value at least one pre-set limit value is exceeded, has a faster recognition of an alarm situation and at the same time a lower rate of false alarms when in a first step for measurement signal values which are subsequent in time their position parameter (2) and a corresponding deviation parameter (3) of the measurement signal values from the position parameter is calculated in an adjustable time window, wherein in a second step each further subsequent measurement signal value is compared to the position parameter (2) an weighted with the deviation parameter (3) in order to obtain a respective evaluation quantity, and wherein in a third step an outlier state (6) is detected when the evaluation quantity exceeds an adjustable outlier parameter, whereas an alarm state (8) indicating the presence of a significant drift or jump of the measurement signal values is detected when the evaluation quantity exceeds an adjustable alarm parameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967758A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6556957 B1 20030429; AT 261164 T 20040315; EP 1097439 A1 20010509; EP 1097439 B1 20040303; WO 9967758 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161020 AND 20161026

2016-10-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TRIUM ANALYSIS ONLINE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRIUM ANALYSIS ONLINE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DAUMER, MARTIN, DR., 81825 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59906785

2016-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906785

- Representative's name: VERSCHT, THOMAS K., DIPL.-PHYS.(UNIV.), DE

2015-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-06-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906785 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4C] CORRECTIONS FOR GRANTED EUROPEAN PATENT

- Free text: THIS CORRECTION WILL BE PUBLISHED IN EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 03/40 DATED 20031001.

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAUMER, MARTIN, DR.

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAUMER, MARTIN, DR.

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE