Global Patent Index - EP 1097440 A4

EP 1097440 A4 2003-06-11 - ENHANCED VISIBILITY TRAFFIC SIGNAL

Title (en)

ENHANCED VISIBILITY TRAFFIC SIGNAL

Title (de)

VERKEHRSAMPEL MIT GRÖSSERER SICHTBARKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SIGNALISATION ROUTIERE A VISIBILITE AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 1097440 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99935568 A

Priority

  • US 9915946 W
  • US 9261898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003370A1] A traffic control signal has a structure upon which traffic control indicia are formed. At least one LED (45a-45h) is formed upon the structure so as to attract attention to the indicia. The LED(s) (45a-45h) have a brightness of at least 6,000 millicandella and preferably have a brightness of between approximately 6,000 millicandella and approximately 60,000 millicandella.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/095; G08G 1/07; G09F 13/06; G09F 13/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/095 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/095 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0003370A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003370 A1 20000120; AU 5102099 A 20000201; AU 769726 B2 20040205; CA 2337057 A1 20000120; CA 2337057 C 20050329; EP 1097440 A1 20010509; EP 1097440 A4 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070828

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051103

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JONES, DALE, G.

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCUM, BARBARA, L.

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLIAMS, JERRY, A.

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLIAMS, PRISCILLA

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE