Global Patent Index - EP 1097479 A1

EP 1097479 A1 2001-05-09 - INTEGRATED ELECTRONIC MICROMODULE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

INTEGRATED ELECTRONIC MICROMODULE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHER INTEGRIERTER MIKROMODUL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES SOLCHEN MIKROMODULS

Title (fr)

MICROMODULE ELECTRONIQUE INTEGRE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL MICROMODULE

Publication

EP 1097479 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99925077 A

Priority

  • FR 9901405 W
  • FR 9808426 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780551A1] Electronic micro modules (30) are produced by forming via holes (36-38) in an insulation layer (33, 34) for connecting flat coils (31) to buried chips. Simultaneous production of several electronic micro modules (30), involves: (a) mounting several chips (1) on a wafer (2); (b) depositing a blanket insulation layer (33, 34); (c) forming insulation layer holes (36-38) at the locations of the chip connection pads (4); (d) forming flat coil windings (31) on the support plate; (e) connecting each coil to a corresponding chip; and (f) dicing the plate to individualize the micro modules. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) an electronic micro module with a chip buried in an insulating layer, on which a coil is provided; and (ii) a hybrid micro module having the above micro module on its back face.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 25/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/077 (2006.01); H01L 23/498 (2006.01); H01L 23/64 (2006.01); H04B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/07747 (2013.01); G06K 19/07749 (2013.01); G06K 19/0775 (2013.01); H01L 23/49855 (2013.01); H01L 23/645 (2013.01); H01L 24/19 (2013.01); H01L 24/82 (2013.01); H04B 5/0087 (2013.01); H01L 2223/6677 (2013.01); H01L 2224/04105 (2013.01); H01L 2224/32225 (2013.01); H01L 2224/45124 (2013.01); H01L 2224/45144 (2013.01); H01L 2224/73267 (2013.01); H01L 2224/92244 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01005 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01006 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01013 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01015 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01029 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01033 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01046 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01058 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01079 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01082 (2013.01); H01L 2924/10253 (2013.01); H01L 2924/14 (2013.01); H01L 2924/19042 (2013.01); H01L 2924/30105 (2013.01); H01L 2924/30107 (2013.01); H01L 2924/3025 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2924/10253 + H01L 2924/00
  2. H01L 2224/45144 + H01L 2924/00014
  3. H01L 2224/45124 + H01L 2924/00014

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780551 A1 19991231; FR 2780551 B1 20010907; AU 4268799 A 20000117; CN 100342536 C 20071010; CN 1315056 A 20010926; EP 1097479 A1 20010509; JP 2002519866 A 20020702; US 6319827 B1 20011120; WO 0001013 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WISEKEY SEMICONDUCTORS

2013-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSIDE SECURE

2011-06-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSIDE SECURE

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSIDE CONTACTLESS

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL