Global Patent Index - EP 1097500 A2

EP 1097500 A2 2001-05-09 - CONTROL SYSTEM WITH INTEGRATED ACTUATION PACKAGE

Title (en)

CONTROL SYSTEM WITH INTEGRATED ACTUATION PACKAGE

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSSYSTEM MIT INTEGRIERTEN MOTORAGGREGAT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE A GROUPE MOTEUR INTEGRE

Publication

EP 1097500 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99965714 A

Priority

  • US 9915880 W
  • US 9294298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0016464A2] A control system for controlling position of an object includes an integrated actuation package utilizing an electric motor driven servopump to control actuator position. The electric motor operates at a constant direction and speed and has augmented system rotational inertia. Additionally, position of a swashplate on the variable displacement servopump is adjusted directly by an electrically powered rotary actuator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 13/40 (2006.01); F04B 1/06 (2006.01); F04B 1/07 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F15B 9/03 (2006.01); F15B 9/04 (2006.01); F15B 9/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 9/04 (2013.01); F15B 15/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0016464 A2 20000323; WO 0016464 A3 20000713; WO 0016464 A9 20010705; EP 1097500 A2 20010509; EP 1097500 A4 20030502; JP 2002525515 A 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040826

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16D 31/02 A

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 9/04 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 15/18 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 1/32 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 64C 13/40 B

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 16D 31/02 A

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE