Global Patent Index - EP 1097550 A1

EP 1097550 A1 2001-05-09 - METHOD FOR SECURE DATA TRANSMISSION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SECURE DATA TRANSMISSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE DE SECURITE POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1097550 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99941955 A

Priority

  • US 9916087 W
  • US 9310698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0004681A1] A method for transmitting data from a first computer to a second computer includes identifying data to be transmitted (10), segmenting the data (15) into a plurality of data packets, the plurality of data packets including at least a first plurality of data packets and a second plurality of data packets, specifying a first transmission (35) carrying medium for transmission of the first plurality of data packets, specifying a second transmission carrying medium for transmission of the second plurality of data packets, transmitting the first plurality of data packets to the first computer network backbone, and transmitting the second plurality of data packets to the second computer network backbone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06; H04J 3/24; H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 63/0428 (2013.01); H04L 12/2856 (2013.01); H04L 63/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004681 A1 20000127; EP 1097550 A1 20010509; EP 1097550 A4 20051109

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-06-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR SECURE DATA TRANSMISSION

2005-11-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 29/06 A

2005-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 B

2005-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04J 3/24 B

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE