Global Patent Index - EP 1097569 A1

EP 1097569 A1 2001-05-09 - SENSOR MATRIX

Title (en)

SENSOR MATRIX

Title (de)

SENSORMATRIX

Title (fr)

MATRICE DE DETECTION

Publication

EP 1097569 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929546 A

Priority

  • DE 19922650 A
  • EP 0004607 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19922650A1] The sensor matrix has light or x-ray sensitive sensor elements arranged in a matrix in rows and columns. Each sensor has a photo-sensor element (1) connected parallel to its connections and a transistor (3). There is at least one switching line (7) per sensor row, via which the transistors can be activated, so that the charges for each activated sensor can be read out simultaneously via readout lines (8). Each sensor has a further transistor (5) connected directly to the photo-sensor element that can be activated via at least one control line. Both transistors per sensor are connected in series and an electrode of a further capacitance (4) is connected to their junction. An Independent claim is also included for a method of operating a sensor matrix.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 3/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/146 (2006.01); H01L 27/14 (2006.01); H01L 31/09 (2006.01); H04N 5/32 (2006.01); H04N 5/355 (2011.01); H04N 5/3745 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/37452 (2013.01); H04N 5/3559 (2013.01); H04N 5/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0070864A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19922650 A1 20001123; EP 1097569 A1 20010509; JP 2003500905 A 20030107; JP 4508429 B2 20100721; US 6894283 B1 20050517; WO 0070864 A1 20001123

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2013-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070628

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI