Global Patent Index - EP 1097586 A1

EP 1097586 A1 2001-05-09 - INTERACTIVE TELEVISION PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM THAT SERVES AS A PORTAL

Title (en)

INTERACTIVE TELEVISION PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM THAT SERVES AS A PORTAL

Title (de)

INTERAKTIVES FERNSEHPROGRAMMFÜHRERSYSTEM DAS ALS PORTAL DIENT

Title (fr)

GUIDE INTERACTIF DE PROGRAMMES DE TELEVISION UTILISE COMME PORTAIL

Publication

EP 1097586 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934092 A

Priority

  • US 9916131 W
  • US 9386598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005889A1] A system is provided in which an interactive television program guide application and non-program-guide applications are at least partially implemented on user television equipment. A program guide program application interface is provided that is used to maintain a consistent user interface between the program guide application and the non-program-guide applications. Non-program-guide applications may be launched by the program guide application. The user may select certain non-program-guide applications as favorites and may set parental controls for certain non-program-guide applications. The program guide application may run in the background while a non-program-guide application operates. While the non-program-guide application operates, the program guide may check for events that require immediate attention. When such an event is detected, operation of the non-program-guide application may be suspended and the user may be asked whether the detected event should take place or whether operation of the non-program-guide application should be resumed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/16; H04N 7/173

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/048 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 7/025 (2006.01); H04N 7/03 (2006.01); H04N 7/035 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01); H04N 7/173 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/4622 (2013.01); H04N 7/163 (2013.01); H04N 7/165 (2013.01); H04N 7/17318 (2013.01); H04N 21/233 (2013.01); H04N 21/2543 (2013.01); H04N 21/25891 (2013.01); H04N 21/44222 (2013.01); H04N 21/4431 (2013.01); H04N 21/4532 (2013.01); H04N 21/454 (2013.01); H04N 21/4751 (2013.01); H04N 21/4753 (2013.01); H04N 21/4755 (2013.01); H04N 21/47805 (2013.01); H04N 21/47815 (2013.01); H04N 21/4782 (2013.01); H04N 21/4786 (2013.01); H04N 21/482 (2013.01); H04N 21/812 (2013.01); H04N 21/8173 (2013.01); H04N 21/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005889A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005889 A1 20000203; AU 5000299 A 20000214; AU 748045 B2 20020530; BR 9912370 A 20010417; CA 2337464 A1 20000203; CA 2337464 C 20030318; CN 1310921 A 20010829; EP 1097586 A1 20010509; EP 2268019 A2 20101229; EP 2268019 A3 20120530; JP 2002521929 A 20020716; JP 2011041297 A 20110224; JP 2014033452 A 20140220; JP 2015216674 A 20151203; JP 2017108442 A 20170615; JP 4851007 B2 20120111; JP 5852302 B2 20160203

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036898

2003-10-01 [R18R] APPLICATION REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030419

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE