Global Patent Index - EP 1097649 A1

EP 1097649 A1 2001-05-09 - Suspension device for an industrial safety helmet

Title (en)

Suspension device for an industrial safety helmet

Title (de)

Innenausstattung für einen Arbeitsschutzhelm

Title (fr)

Coiffe intérieure pour casque de protection à usage sur les chantiers

Publication

EP 1097649 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810999 A

Priority

EP 99810999 A

Abstract (en)

The internal fitting system for a safety helmet (1) comprises a headband (3) and straps (7) which fit over the top of the head. These have studs (81) at their ends which point away from the head and fit into slits (61) on tabs attached to the headband.

Abstract (de)

Die Innenausstattung des Arbeitsschutzhelms, welche innerlich der äusseren Helmschale (1) angeordnet ist, besteht aus einem Kopfband (3), eventuell einem Schweissband, und dem Tragband (7). Das Charakteristische ist, dass an den Endstücken (80), welche an den Bandabschnitten (70) des Tragbandes (7) sitzen, ein zur Innenseite gewandtes nasenförmiges Fixierorgan (81) vorhanden ist und sich vom Kopfband (3) Laschen (60) erstrecken, die ein zum Fixierorgan (81) komplementäres schlitzförmiges Verbindungselement (61) aufweisen, wodurch sich die Laschen (60) lösbar unmittelbar an den Endstücken (80) anhängen lassen. Die besonderen Vorteile der erfindungsgemässen Innenausstattung liegen in der entscheidend verbesserten Benutzerfreundlichkeit, insbesondere beim Einstellen auf die individuelle Kopfanatomie sowie in der Ermöglichung einer effizienteren Serienproduktion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097649 A1 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI