Global Patent Index - EP 1097655 A2

EP 1097655 A2 2001-05-09 - Toothbrushes

Title (en)

Toothbrushes

Title (de)

Zahnbürsten

Title (fr)

Brosses à dents

Publication

EP 1097655 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00125873 A

Priority

  • EP 96931374 A
  • US 202695 P
  • US 518496 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1074200A2] A toothbrush is disclosed having a handle portion and a head portion carrying or adapted to carry a bristle configuration. The handle has an end portion, a waist, a shoulder portion and a neck connecting the shoulder to the head. The waist is narrower, at least in plan view, than the end portion or the shoulder, and the end portion, preferably, is rounded. The bristle configuration is such that the teeth engaging ends of the bristles do not lie in a plane parallel to the surface of the head of the handle in which the bristles are embedded. In a first embodiment, the teeth engaging ends of at least a proportion of the bristles lie in a curved line when the toothbrush is viewed in side elevation. The curved line is provided by a mixture of concave groups of bristles and convex groups of bristles. In a second embodiment, the bristle configuration falls into at least two groups of bristles. The teeth engaging ends of the bristles of the first group, and the teeth engaging ends of the bristles of the second group, lie in curved lines when the toothbrush is viewed in side elevation. In a third embodiment, the teeth engaging ends of the bristles form a continuous wavy line. In a fourth embodiment, the teeth engaging ends of the bristles fall into two groups, a rearwardly located group, the castellated group, made up of transversely extending rows of bristles, the rows alternating in height, and a forwardly located group having at least some bristles extending further from the surface of the toothbrush head than any of the bristles of the castellated group. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/02 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/02 (2013.01); A46B 9/045 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1074200 A2 20010207; EP 1074200 A3 20030212; EP 1074200 B1 20060524; EP 1074200 B2 20150909; EP 1097655 A2 20010509; EP 1097655 A3 20030212

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037496

2005-06-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040429

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRADY, JOAN

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BENEDICT, HELEN

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAGUESPACK, KENNETH

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OXSETH, GEIR

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VESTHEIM, NILS TERJE

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SLETBAK, HELGE

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANGELFOSS, HILDE

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRADY, JOAN

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BENEDICT, HELEN

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAGUESPACK, KENNETH

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OXSETH, GEIR

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VESTHEIM, NILS TERJE

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SLETBAK, HELGE

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANGELFOSS, HILDE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-05-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 957707

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE