Global Patent Index - EP 1097666 A2

EP 1097666 A2 2001-05-09 - A dustproof vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

A dustproof vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Staubdichter Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur étanche à la poussière

Publication

EP 1097666 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124407 A

Priority

IT TO990957 A

Abstract (en)

In a vacuum cleaner, the air is not expelled into the environment but is recirculated into the suction region; this prevents the dispersal of any traces of dust into the environment. The vacuum cleaner has advantages with regard to power, energy, and noise and enables the air to be treated with physical/chemical aids. A "robot" structure benefits particularly from this innovation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 5/14; A47L 7/04; A47L 9/08; A47L 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/14 (2006.01); A47L 7/04 (2006.01); A47L 9/08 (2006.01); A47L 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/14 (2013.01); A47L 7/04 (2013.01); A47L 9/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097666 A2 20010509; EP 1097666 A3 20041027; EP 1097666 B1 20090401; DE 60041903 D1 20090514; IT 1308868 B1 20020111; IT TO990957 A1 20000207

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60041903

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100105

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090712

2009-05-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60041903 P 20090514

2009-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2009-04-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071030

2006-08-09 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050411

2006-06-14 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050411

2006-05-24 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-07-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050411

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47L 5/14 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47L 9/08 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47L 7/04 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47L 9/22 B

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI