Global Patent Index - EP 1097688 A2

EP 1097688 A2 2001-05-09 - Framework, used particularly for constructing the sides for wheelchairs for disabled people and wheelchairs made with this system

Title (en)

Framework, used particularly for constructing the sides for wheelchairs for disabled people and wheelchairs made with this system

Title (de)

Rahmengestell, insbesondere zur Verwendung für die Herstellung der Seiten von Rollstühlen für Behinderte und Rollstühle, die mit diesem System hergestellt wurden

Title (fr)

Cadre utilisé en particulier pour la construction des flancs de fauteuils roulants et fauteuils roulants construits avec ce système

Publication

EP 1097688 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123722 A

Priority

IT TV990119 A

Abstract (en)

Framework, used particularly for constructing the sides for wheelchairs for disabled people and wheelchairs with this system, made up of two equal and opposite sides, with each side made up of a tubular element bent accordingly to shape and supported on its back part by a corresponding large wheel. The said element laterally supports a foldable seat and relative back, while on the front side, by means of an extension, it holds a corresponding swivelling wheel and the lateral extremity of a footrest. Each side is made up of off-round tubular elements, preferably elliptical, joined laterally with a jaw-clamp to an adjustable plate or similar means, used for mounting the corresponding large wheel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/00 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/08 (2013.01); A61G 5/00 (2013.01); A61G 5/10 (2013.01); A61G 5/1075 (2013.01); A61G 5/1097 (2016.11); A61G 5/1059 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097688 A2 20010509; EP 1097688 A3 20010919; IT 1311660 B1 20020314; IT TV990119 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-13 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061027

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI