Global Patent Index - EP 1097689 A2

EP 1097689 A2 2001-05-09 - Adjustable plate for fixing to the sides of a seat with its relative back and accessories, used particularly for wheelchairs for disabled people, and wheelchairs made with this system

Title (en)

Adjustable plate for fixing to the sides of a seat with its relative back and accessories, used particularly for wheelchairs for disabled people, and wheelchairs made with this system

Title (de)

Verstellbare Platte zur Befestigung an den Sitzseiten, ausgestattet mit einer Rückenlehne und Zubehör, insbesondere zur Verwendung für Behindertenrollstühle, sowie Rollstühle, die mit diesem System hergestellt wurden

Title (fr)

Plaque réglable pour fixer aux flancs d'un siège avec son dossier et accessoires, utilisée en particulier pour des fauteuils roulants et fauteuils roulants construits avec ce système

Publication

EP 1097689 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123723 A

Priority

IT TV990118 A

Abstract (en)

Adjustable plate for fixing to the sides of a seat with its relative back and accessories, used particularly for wheelchairs for disabled people and wheelchairs with this system. It is made up of two equal and opposite sides, with each side made up of a tubular element bent accordingly to shape and supported on its back part by a corresponding large wheel. The said element laterally supports a foldable seat and relative back, while on the front side, by means of an extension, holds a corresponding swivelling wheel and the lateral extremity of a footrest. Each side is joined to an adjustable plate that has, around its perimeter: two straight bars, at least one of which, being manufactured with a series of through holes, acts as an adjustment rod. The said bars come together on one side to form a hole in common with each other where a large wheel is attached; a third adjustment bar manufactured with a series of through holes and with a curved section, that joins the opposite ends of the said straight bars. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/08 (2013.01); A61G 5/00 (2013.01); A61G 5/1075 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097689 A2 20010509; EP 1097689 A3 20010919; IT 1311659 B1 20020314; IT TV990118 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071019

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI