Global Patent Index - EP 1097690 A2

EP 1097690 A2 2001-05-09 - Patient or nursing bed

Title (en)

Patient or nursing bed

Title (de)

Kranken- oder Pflegebett

Title (fr)

Lit pour malades ou de soins

Publication

EP 1097690 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123645 A

Priority

DE 19952824 A

Abstract (en)

The patient's bed (1) has an underneath frame (3) in relation to which, movable on the bed's lengthwise axis, is a height adjustable, continuously and or intermittently swiveling frame (6). The swiveling frame is positioned on an extra top frame (2) joined to the bottom frame but not adjustable in height. The top frame is movably connected to the bottom frame by at least one hoist-frame (4,5). One or both of the hoist-frames comprise a top (10) and bottom (11) lifting arm linked together

Abstract (de)

Kranken- oder Pflegebett (1) insbesondere mit Eignung für die Decubitusprophylaxe mit einem unteren Rahmen (3) sowie einem gegenüber diesem höhenverschiebbarem und um eine Längsachse des Kranken- oder Pflegebetts (1) kontinuierlich und/oder intermittierend schwenkbarem Rahmen (6), wobei das Kranken- oder Pflegebett (1) zusätzlich einen oberen Rahmen (2) umfaßt, wobei der schwenkbare Rahmen (6) schwenkbeweglich an dem oberen Rahmen (2) angeordnet ist, der selbst nicht schwenkbar höhenverschiebbar mit dem unteren Rahmen (3) verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/08 (2006.01); A61G 7/008 (2006.01); A61G 7/012 (2006.01); A61G 7/015 (2006.01); A61G 7/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/0507 (2013.01); A61G 7/008 (2013.01); A61G 7/012 (2013.01); A61G 7/0509 (2016.11); A61G 7/0514 (2016.11); A61G 7/015 (2013.01); A61G 7/0573 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19723927 A1 19981210 - WEIGELIN HANS GUENTHER DR MED [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097690 A2 20010509; EP 1097690 A3 20020116

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI