Global Patent Index - EP 1097730 A1

EP 1097730 A1 2001-05-09 - Racket for ball games

Title (en)

Racket for ball games

Title (de)

Schläger für Ballspiele

Title (fr)

Raquette pour jeux de balles

Publication

EP 1097730 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123052 A

Priority

DE 19953626 A

Abstract (en)

The racquet or bat (30) has a hitting-head , a handle part between which is a frame possessing a heart-shaped piece (34).. The profiled part forming the frame has varying cross-sectional shapes corresponding to the main types of stress occurring. The frame has at least two bump-shaped reinforcement elements (51,53).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Schläger (30), insbesondere einen Tennisschläger in besonders geeigneter Festigkeitsausführung und mit geringem Gewicht. Dazu weist der erfindungsgemäße Schläger für Ballspiele einen Schlägerkopf (32), einen Herzbereich (34) und einen Griffabschnitt (36) auf, die zusammen einen Rahmen bilden. Das den Rahmen bildende Profil weist an unterschiedlichen Rahmenpositionen entsprechend den dort auftretenden Hauptbeanspruchungsarten verschiedene Querschnittsformen auf, die an die jeweiligen Beanspruchungsarten angepaßte Widerstandsmomente haben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 49/02 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 49/02 (2013.01); A63B 49/10 (2013.01); A63B 49/12 (2013.01); A63B 2049/0201 (2015.10); A63B 2049/0211 (2013.01); A63B 2049/0217 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097730 A1 20010509; EP 1097730 B1 20041020; AT 279962 T 20041115; CN 1158116 C 20040721; CN 1294934 A 20010516; DE 19953626 A1 20010621; DE 19953626 B4 20040205; DE 20023541 U1 20041007; TW 487589 B 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEAD TECHNOLOGY GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEAD SPORT GMBH, KENNELBACH, AT

- Document: DE 50008315

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008315

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-09-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008315

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2010-04-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-30 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2010-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HEAD SPORT GMBH

- Free text: HEAD SPORT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WUHRKOPFWEG 1#6921 KENNELBACH (AT) -TRANSFER TO- HEAD SPORT GMBH#WUHRKOPFWEG 1#6921 KENNELBACH (AT)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HEAD SPORT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: HEAD SPORT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WUHRKOPFWEG 1#6921 KENNELBACH (AT) -TRANSFER TO- HEAD SPORT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WUHRKOPFWEG 1#6921 KENNELBACH (AT)

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008315 P 20041125

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI