Global Patent Index - EP 1097732 A3

EP 1097732 A3 2001-05-23 - Binding for snowglider, especially snowboards

Title (en)

Binding for snowglider, especially snowboards

Title (de)

Bindung für Gleitbretter, insbesondere Snowbords

Title (fr)

Fixation pour planche de glisse, notamment snowboards

Publication

EP 1097732 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01103539 A

Priority

  • DE 4304876 A
  • DE 4311630 A
  • EP 99109643 A
  • EP 94102188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0934762A1] The back binding element (9a) for holding the boot (1) in the binding in a first axial direction at right angles to the boot's lengthwise axis and parallel to the boot's underside, forms two support surfaces (14). A matching surface on the boot is next to the support surfaces. The boot has at least one protuberance (5) on the heel (4). The back binding element has at least one recess (15) in which is a hole in which the protuberance fits. The recess has a locking unit formed by at least one locking element (16) for locking the protuberance in the recess.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08; A63C 9/086

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/08 (2012.01); A63C 10/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/10 (2013.01); A63C 10/08 (2013.01); A63C 10/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4311630 A1 19940818; DE 4311630 C2 19950202; EP 0934762 A1 19990811; EP 0934762 B1 20010912; EP 1097732 A2 20010509; EP 1097732 A3 20010523; EP 1097732 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100212

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100212

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JULIAN DAVID WILLIAMS C/O INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS M

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59410295 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0934762 P

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0615774 P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-08-17 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63C 9/08 A, 7A 63C 9/086 B

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-05-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 615774

2001-05-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 934762

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI