Global Patent Index - EP 1097748 A1

EP 1097748 A1 2001-05-09 - Air filter with electrostatic separator

Title (en)

Air filter with electrostatic separator

Title (de)

Luftfilter mit einem elektrostatischen Abscheider

Title (fr)

Filtre à air avec séparateur électrostatique

Publication

EP 1097748 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121830 A

Priority

DE 19953222 A

Abstract (en)

The air filter has an electrostatic separator with a high voltage electrode (9) and a low voltage electrode (7), between which the air flow (4) to be cleaned is passed. One (7) electrode forms a wall of a channel of closed cross-section for the air flow to be cleaned. The other electrode (9) is arranged in the channel so shortest distance between the inner electrode and the so-called channel wall electrode is approximately equal at all points.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Luftfilter, insbesondere ein Ansaug-Luftfilter für eine Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem elektrostatischen Abscheider in Form einer Hochspannungs-Elektrode und einer Niederschlags-Elektrode, zwischen denen der zu reinigende Luftstrom hindurchgeführt wird. Erfindungsgemäß bildet eine der beiden Elektroden eine Kanalwand eines im Querschnitt geschlossenen Kanales für den zu reinigenden Luftstrom, innerhalb dessen die andere Elektrode derart angeordnet ist, daß der kürzeste Abstand zwischen dieser inneren Elektrode und der sog. Kanalwand-Elektrode an allen Punkten nahezu gleich ist. Bevorzugt besitzt der Querschnitt des Kanales im wesentlichen die Form eines gestreckten Rechteckes mit abgerundeten Ecken besitzt, wobei im Luftfilter-Gehäuse mehrere derartige Kanäle mit ihren längeren Seitenwänden nebeneinander liegend vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/06; B03C 3/08; F02M 27/04; F02M 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/06 (2006.01); B03C 3/08 (2006.01); F02M 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/02 (2013.01); B03C 3/06 (2013.01); B03C 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097748 A1 20010509; DE 19953222 A1 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI