Global Patent Index - EP 1097753 A1

EP 1097753 A1 2001-05-09 - New centrifugal casting method for rolling mill rolls with a fixed connection without any porosity between outer layer made of high speed steel and the core made of nodular cast iron

Title (en)

New centrifugal casting method for rolling mill rolls with a fixed connection without any porosity between outer layer made of high speed steel and the core made of nodular cast iron

Title (de)

Neues vertikales Zentrifugalgiessverfahren für Walzen mit fester, nicht poröser Verbindung zwischen der äusseren Schicht aus Schnellstahl und dem Kern aus Sphäroguss

Title (fr)

Nouveau procédé de coulée centrifuge verticale pour cylindres de laminoirs permettant d'obtenir une liaison saine et sans porosités entre la couche externe en acier rapide et la fonte nodulaire du coeur.

Publication

EP 1097753 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403048 A

Priority

FR 9913845 A

Abstract (en)

A method for the vertical centrifugal casting of a bimetallic rolling mill roll with an envelope of rapid high carbon steel is characterised in that the casting of the nodular iron core metal is only carried out after the complete solidification of all the eutectic phases in the high carbon steel.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention est relative à un procédé de coulée centrifuge d'axe vertical, utilisé notamment pour la fabrication des cylindres de laminoir bimétalliques ou composites dont la couche externe présente des eutectiques multiples. D'une façon générale, le procédé de coulée traditionnel est utilisé pour des cylindres utilisant une couche externe à eutectique unique. Dans le cas d'une couche externe à eutectiques multiples, l'application du procédé traditionnel, en cherchant à ne pas polluer le coeur en éléments carburigènes, conduit à la formation de porosités juste avant l'interface. Ces porosités conduisent fréquemment à de graves écaillages en service. Le nouveau procédé de coulée permet au contraire d'éliminer les microporosités en prolongeant le refroidissement de l'enveloppe jusqu'à la solidification de tous les eutectiques, mais en utilisant une couche de métal secondaire dont l'épaisseur et la température de coulée permettent tout à la fois d'apporter l'énergie thermique nécessaire et suffisante pour assurer une bonne liaison des deux couches tout en évitant de refondre une partie de l'enveloppe qui viendrait alors polluer le coeur en éléments carburigènes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 27/00; B22D 13/02; B22D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/00 (2006.01); B22D 13/02 (2006.01); B22D 19/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 13/026 (2013.01); B21B 27/00 (2013.01); B22D 19/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] FR 2765819 A1 19990115 - WERQUIN JEAN C [FR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 134 (M - 479) 17 May 1986 (1986-05-17)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097753 A1 20010509; EP 1097753 B1 20040128; AT 258471 T 20040215; DE 60007938 D1 20040304; DE 60007938 T2 20041104; ES 2215013 T3 20041001; FR 2800306 A1 20010504; FR 2800306 B1 20011207

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131103

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131102

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60007938

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131102

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131103

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131102

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WERQUIN JEAN-CLAUDE

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121231

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121207

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2008-12-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040628

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041102

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215013 T3

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007938 P 20040304

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-03-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES GB IT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010905

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI