Global Patent Index - EP 1097757 A1

EP 1097757 A1 2001-05-09 - Method and apparatus for controlling the quality of deformations realised by a machine for forming the ends of tubes

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling the quality of deformations realised by a machine for forming the ends of tubes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Qualitätsprüfung der Werkstücksverformungen durch eine Rohrendverformungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de la qualité des formages réalisés par une machine a former des extrémités de tubes

Publication

EP 1097757 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00390020 A

Priority

FR 9913832 A

Abstract (en)

The first step is to record the maximum stress exerted on the tube then check the quality of the shape and store results in a table. Then the tubes manufactured with stress within the correct range will be considered of good quality. Machine comprises tube holding means (1), shaping tool (9a) fixed on telescopic organ (10) can translate along the direction (x) of the tube length between a working position and a tube release position and a stress sensor (33). Independent claim is also included for a tube shaping machine.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de contrôle de la qualité des formages réalisés par une machine à former des extrémités de tubes selon lequel on équipe la machine à former d'un capteur d'effort (33) apte à mesurer l'effort axial de réaction exercé par le tube sur l'outil (9a) lors d'une passe de formage, et pour chaque formage, dans une phase préalable d'apprentissage, on mesure l'effort axial maximal de réaction exercé par le tube sur l'outil (9a), on vérifie, de façon classique, la qualité du formage réalisé, et on mémorise la valeur de l'effort axial maximal de réaction obtenu lors d'un formage de qualité satisfaisant aux exigences requises, puis, lors de chaque passe de formage, on mesure l'effort axial maximal de réaction exercé par le tube sur l'outil (9a), on compare la valeur dudit effort axial maximal avec la valeur de référence mémorisée, et on valide le formage si l'effort axial maximal mesuré correspond à l'effort de référence avec une tolérance prédéterminée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 19/00; B21D 41/00; B21D 41/04; B23Q 15/007; B23Q 17/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097757 A1 20010509; FR 2800652 A1 20010511; US 6382008 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031107

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JAUBERT, PHILIPPE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI