Global Patent Index - EP 1097761 A1

EP 1097761 A1 2001-05-09 - Device for forming tube ends

Title (en)

Device for forming tube ends

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Rohrenden

Title (fr)

Machine à former des extrémités de tubes

Publication

EP 1097761 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00390018 A

Priority

FR 9913829 A

Abstract (en)

The machine consists of a frame (3) with a clamp and lock (1, 2) and at least one tool (12a, 13a) in a holder (12, 13) for shaping the end of a clamped tube. The tools and holders are advanced and retracted by a pusher assembly (26, 28) with a coupling for each tool holder, and a guide (29) to control the movement of the assembly in line with the tube axis (x - x). The pusher assembly is actuated by a mechanism with two levers (33, 34) and one or two pneumatic cylinders (38).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une machine à former des extrémités de tubes dotée de moyens de déplacement en translation selon un axe de formage (x) d'un outil (13a) comprenant, d'une part, deux biellettes (33, 34) disposées dans le prolongement l'une de l'autre et articulées l'une par rapport à l'autre au moyen d'un axe d'articulation (35), orthogonal à l'axe (x), l'une des dites biellettes (33) étant articulée sur un ensemble-poussoir (26-28) au moyen d'un axe d'articulation (36), perpendiculaire à l'axe (x), et l'autre biellette (34) étant articulée sur un élément de butée (37) au moyen d'un axe d'articulation (50) perpendiculaire à l'axe (x), et d'autre part, des moyens (38, 39) d'actionnement des biellettes (33, 34) adaptés pour déplacer de façon alternative l'axe central d'articulation (35) desdites biellettes selon un axe (y) perpendiculaire à l'axe (x), entre deux positions extrêmes situées symétriquement de part et d'autre dudit axe (x). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097761 A1 20010509; FR 2800650 A1 20010511; FR 2800650 B1 20020125

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI