Global Patent Index - EP 1097763 A1

EP 1097763 A1 2001-05-09 - CONTINUOUS CASTING NOZZLE

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS CASTING NOZZLE

Title (de)

STRANGGIESSDÜSE

Title (fr)

TUYERE DE COULEE EN CONTINU

Publication

EP 1097763 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912101 A

Priority

JP 9901787 W

Abstract (en)

A continuous casting nozzle for casting molten steel, wherein at least a surface layer of an inner bore of the continuous casting nozzle contacting with a molten steel is formed of a refractory comprising: an aggregate consisting essentially of alumina (Al2O3) or an aggregate comprising alumina (Al2O3) as its main ingredient and melting point thereof being at least 1800 degree centigrade: from 15 to 60 wt.% and roseki as a balance. The refractory is added thermosetting resin as binder, kneaded, formed, and sintered in an anti-oxidizing atmosphere. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10; B22D 41/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/101 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 41/54 (2006.01); C04B 35/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097763 A1 20010509; EP 1097763 A4 20011114; EP 1097763 B1 20040929; AT 277704 T 20041015; AU 3055899 A 20001023; AU 746450 B2 20020502; CA 2312482 A1 20001005; CA 2312482 C 20061121; DE 69920709 D1 20041104; DE 69920709 T2 20060209; KR 100367647 B1 20030110; KR 20010040299 A 20010515; WO 0059657 A1 20001012

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160405

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160405

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150401

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050109

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920709 P 20041104

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-11-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 22D 11/10 A, 7B 22D 41/50 B, 7B 22D 41/54 B

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT