Global Patent Index - EP 1097769 A1

EP 1097769 A1 2001-05-09 - Method of manufacturing a preform or product from dispersion strengthened silver based alloys

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a preform or product from dispersion strengthened silver based alloys

Title (de)

Verfahren zu Herstellung von Halbzeug und Formkörpern aus partikelverstärkten Silberwerkstoffen

Title (fr)

Procedé de fabrication d'un produit ou préform d'une alliage à base d'argent renforcée par dispersion

Publication

EP 1097769 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123511 A

Priority

DE 19953780 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19953780C1] Production of semi-finished material and molded bodies comprises intensively mixing silver and silver alloy powder as matrix powder and powdered particles that increase the strength of the matrix material, and processing to the semi-finished material and molded bodies by pressing and sintering.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Halbzeug und Formkörpern aus partikelverstärkten Silberbasiswerkstoffen auf pulvermetallurgischem Weg über mechanisches Legieren. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, die Herstellung so zu gestalten, dass der mittlere Durchmesser der in dem Matrixwerkstoff verteilten festigkeitssteigernden Partikel unter 100 nm liegt. Dabei sollen gleichzeitig ein geringer Gasgehalt und eine hohe Pulverausbeute gewährleistet werden. Diese Aufgabe wird nach der Erfindung dadurch gelöst, dass Silber- oder Silberlegierungspulver als Matrixwerkstoff und pulverförmige, die Festigkeit des Matrixwerkstoffs steigernde Partikel gemeinsam einem intensiven Mahlprozess bei Temperaturen unterhalb von -10°C unterworfen werden. Danach wird dieses Pulver in an sich bekannter Weise mittels Pressen und Sintern zu Halbzeug oder Formkörpern verarbeitet. Die mit dem Verfahren herstellbaren Produkte sind beispielsweise in der Elektrotechnik als Kontaktmaterialien verwendbar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 1/00; B22F 9/04; C22C 1/10; C22C 5/06; H01H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 9/04 (2006.01); C22C 1/10 (2006.01); C22C 5/06 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/021 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 32/00 (2013.01); B22F 9/04 (2013.01); C22C 1/1084 (2013.01); C22C 5/06 (2013.01); H01H 1/021 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2999/00 + B22F 9/04 + B22F 2202/03

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0370180 A1 19900530 - ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP], et al
  • [A] US 4090874 A 19780523 - KAUFMAN SYDNEY M
  • [Y] XU, J. (LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY) ET AL: "Nanocrystalline Ag formed by low-temperature high-energy mechanical attrition.", NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS (JAN.-FEB. 1997) 8, (1), 91-100, DIFFRACTION PATTERNS, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, NUMERICAL DATA, GRAPHS, 22 REF. ISSN: 0965-9773, XP002161023
  • [Y] GRUNDMANN, U. (INSTITUT FUR FESTKORPER- UND WERKSTOFFORSCHUNG DRESDEN) ET AL: "Deformation behaviour of oxide-dispersion-strengthened silver.", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A (1997) A234-236, 505-508, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, GRAPHS, 11 REF.. SWITZERLAND CONFERENCE: 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE STRENGTH OF MATERIALS, PRAGUE, CZECH REPUBLIC, 25-29 AUG. 1997 ISSN: 0921-5093, XP002161024
  • [Y] "High temperature deformation behaviour of mechanically alloyed microcrystalline ODS silver.", SCRIPTA MATERIALIA (1 JULY 1997) VOL.37, NO.1, P.103-9. 13 REFS. DOC. NO.: S1359-6462(97)00059-6 PUBLISHED BY: ELSEVIER FOR BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ACTA METALL PRICE: CCCC 1359-6462/97/$17.00+.00 CODEN: SCRMBU ISSN: 1359-6462 SICI: 1359-6462(19970701)3, XP002161025

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19953780 C1 20010412; EP 1097769 A1 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI