Global Patent Index - EP 1097781 A2

EP 1097781 A2 2001-05-09 - Apparatus for finishing metal surfaces

Title (en)

Apparatus for finishing metal surfaces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Endbearbeiten von metallischen Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la finition de surfaces métalliques

Publication

EP 1097781 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124142 A

Priority

IT MI992330 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for surface finishing of metal pieces, in particular for satin-polishing extractor hoods (10) and the like. The apparatus comprises a first work unit (17) provided with a rotating brush (18) and a second work unit (14) for supporting the metal piece (10), which can be positioned frontally one in relation to the other. Both work units (14, 17) are movable along respective slide guides (12, 13; 15, 16) in planes at right angles one to the other; each work unit (14, 17) is also provided with three controlled axes (Al, A2, A3; A4, A5, A6), each of which is operatively connected to a control device designed to send reference signals to a programmable process unit (CPU) so as to sequentially orientate each surface (S) of the metal piece (10) along a reference plane, for example parallel to the vertical sliding plane of the work unit (17) for supporting the rotating brush (18), and respectively to move the same brush (18) along two orthogonal axes (A2, A5) parallel to the reference plane, according to a programmed work path (D0-D9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 27/04; B24B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 27/04 (2006.01); B24B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 29/005 (2013.01); B24B 27/04 (2013.01); B24B 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097781 A2 20010509; EP 1097781 A3 20030917; IT 1314012 B1 20021203; IT MI992330 A1 20010508; IT MI992330 D0 19991108

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI