Global Patent Index - EP 1097785 A2

EP 1097785 A2 2001-05-09 - Powder-actuated fastener driving tool

Title (en)

Powder-actuated fastener driving tool

Title (de)

Pulverkraftbetriebenes Setzgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de scellement actionné par poudre

Publication

EP 1097785 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810096 A

Priority

DE 19905896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19905896A1] The insertion device includes am annular sector (7) to receive and guide the seal element (9), which is supported outside the cartridge bed (3) on the first part. At least one channel (13) connects the engaging surface (16) of the seal element to the cartridge bed. The seal element is able to be displaced relative to the second part parallel to the direction of insertion.

Abstract (de)

Das pulverkraftbetriebene Setzgerät weiat zwei Teile auf, wobei eines der beiden Teile ein Kartuschenlager (3) aufweist das der Aufnahme einer Folienkartusche dient. Das zweite Teil deckt die axiale Projektionsfläche des Kartuschenlagers (3) mit einer Gegen fläche (14) teilweise ab. Die Gegenfläche (14) umgibt ein kreisringförmiger Ausschnitt (7), welcher der Aufnahme und der Führung eines ringförmigen Dichtungselementes (9) dient, das sich ausserhalb des Kartuschenlagers (3) an dem ersten Teil abstützt. Wenigstens ein Verbindungkanal (13) verbindet eine entgegen der Setzrichtung weisende Angriffsfläche (16) des Dichtungselementes (9) mit dem Kartuschenlager (3). Aufgrund der Versetzbarkeit des Dichtungselementes (9) parallel zur Setzrichtung, lässt sich dieses mit zunehmenden, von der Kartusche (4) erzeugten Treibgasdruck immer stärker in Setzrichtung, unter Zwischenlage eines Deckelteiles (6) und eines Aufnahmeeiles (5), gegen das erste Teil drücken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/10 (2006.01); B25C 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/105 (2013.01); B25C 1/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19905896 A1 20000817; AU 1016300 A 20000817; AU 753510 B2 20021017; CA 2297649 A1 20000811; CN 1140383 C 20040303; CN 1262983 A 20000816; DE 50012720 D1 20060614; EP 1097785 A2 20010509; EP 1097785 A3 20040114; EP 1097785 B1 20060510; JP 2000237974 A 20000905; PL 189708 B1 20050930; PL 338345 A1 20000814; TW 506883 B 20021021; US 6286743 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012720

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012720 P 20060614

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI